Carroll County Delegation

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 7 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 7)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0298Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Farmers' MarketsIn the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0305 / CH0469
    (SB0429 / CH0468)
Carroll County - Budgeting and Finance Procedures - Surplus FundsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 469Appropriations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0307Carroll County - Maintenance of Effort - Adjustment for Decreasing Student EnrollmentIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteePrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0310
    (SB0430)
Carroll County - GamingIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeGaming (C7)
HB0319 / CH0467
    (SB0428 / CH0466)
Carroll County - Board of Education - Nonvoting Student RepresentativeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 467Ways and Means
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteePrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0543 / CH0618Carroll County - Deer Hunting - SundaysApproved by the Governor - Chapter 618Environmental Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0846
    (SB0588 / CH0063)
Carroll County - Public Facilities BondsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeLocal Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:27 P.M.