Carroll County Senators

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 9 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 9)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
SB0037
    (HB0158)
Carroll County - GamingIn the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-1)Budget and Taxation
1/22/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeGaming (C7)
SB0040 / CH0008
    (HB0181)
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Circuit Court for Carroll County - Fees for Appearance of CounselApproved by the Governor - Chapter 8Judicial Proceedings
1/21/2014 - 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB0555 / CH0063
    (HB0545)
Carroll County - Public Facilities BondsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 63Budget and Taxation
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeLocal Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
SB0556 / CH0179
    (HB0211)
Carroll County - Orphans' Court Judges - SalaryApproved by the Governor - Chapter 179Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB0557 / CH0064
    (HB0182)
Carroll County - Sheriff - SalaryApproved by the Governor - Chapter 64Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB0558 / CH0303
    (HB0183)
Carroll County - Local Government Tort Claims Act - Industrial Development AuthorityApproved by the Governor - Chapter 303Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0559
    (HB0369)
Creation of a State Debt - Carroll County - The Arc of Carroll County Building RenovationIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 4:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/8/2014 - 4:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0560 / CH0523Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - License FeesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 523Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0561
    (HB0210)
Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container PermitIn the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:32 P.M.