Carroll County Senators

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 7 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 7)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
SB0275 / CH0267
    (HB0610 / CH0266)
Carroll County - Gaming - Repeal of Sunday ProhibitionApproved by the Governor - Chapter 267Budget and Taxation
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeGaming (C7)
SB0359 / CH0264
    (HB0621 / CH0265)
Carroll County - Board of Education - Student RepresentativeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 264Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/2018 - 12:45 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeEducation - Local Bills (F3)
SB0360
    (HB0609 / CH0089)
Carroll County - Public Facilities BondsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/20/2018 - 1:15 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeLocal Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)
SB0437
    (HB1000)
Creation of a State Debt - Carroll County - Boys and Girls Club of WestminsterIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0542 / CH0269
    (HB0984 / CH0268)
Carroll County - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Medical ServicesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 269Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationBy Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0735 / CH0832
    (HB0885 / CH0831)
Carroll County - Board of Education - CompensationEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 832Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeEducation - Local Bills (F3)
SB1152
    (HB1116 / CH0493)
Public Safety - Agritourism - Permit ExemptionIn the House - Rereferred to Environment and TransportationEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationBy Request - CommitteePublic Safety (E4)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 31, 2018 1:02 P.M.