Cecil County Delegation

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 10 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 10)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0246 / CH0576
    (SB0716 / CH0575)
Public Safety - Fire Police - Cecil CountyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 576Judiciary
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsBy Request - CommitteePublic Safety (E4)
HB0247Cecil County - Community Adult Rehabilitation Center - Appointment and Removal of Assistant DirectorIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryBy Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0761
    (SB0733)
Cecil County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of ProceedsIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeGaming (C7)
HB0767
    (SB0714)
Creation of a State Debt - Cecil County - YMCA of Cecil County Outdoor PoolIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/12/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0815 / CH0497
    (SB1116)
Horse Racing - Fair Hill - Arabian Breed Racing AuthorizationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 497Ways and Means
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeHorse Racing (C6)
HB0816 / CH0632Cecil County - Sheriff - SalaryApproved by the Governor - Chapter 632Environment and Transportation
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB0824Cecil County - Orphans' Court Judges - Traveling Expense Allowance and PensionIn the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeEstates and Trusts (N2)
HB0832 / CH0125
    (SB0715)
Cecil County - Marriage Licenses - ApplicationsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 125Judiciary
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsBy Request - CommitteeFamily Law (D4)
HB0835 / CH0569
    (SB0631 / CH0568)
Local Facility Closure Reserve Funds - Investments and ReinvestmentsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 569Appropriations
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeLocal Government - Generally (L6)
HB1071 / CH0455
    (SB0958 / CH0454)
Cecil County - Alcoholic Beverages - LicensesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 455Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:07 P.M.