Cecil County Delegation

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 5 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 5)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0284 / CH0607
    (SB0636)
Cecil County - Office of the Sheriff - Employees and Collective BargainingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 607Appropriations
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB0373 / CH0608Cecil County - Home Detention and Release ProgramsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 608Judiciary
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0379
    (SB1132)
Creation of a State Debt - Cecil County - Bee Hive Colonial VillageIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0411 / CH0068
    (SB1057 / CH0067)
Cecil County - Alcoholic Beverages - Alcohol Awareness ProgramApproved by the Governor - Chapter 68Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0849
    (SB1133)
Creation of a State Debt - Cecil County - Perryville Railroad Monument SignIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 18, 2018 4:02 P.M.