Cecil County Senators

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 3 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 3)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
SB0392 / CH0253Cecil County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable ContainersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 253Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB1011
    (HB1171 / CH0672)
Cecil County - School Buses - Length of OperationIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsBy Request - CommitteePrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB1012
    (HB1424)
Alcohol and Drug Abuse Administration - Opioid Maintenance Therapy Program - RequirementsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteePublic Health (J1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:27 P.M.