Cecil County Senators

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 2 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 2)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
SB0243 / CH0047Cecil County - Board of Elections - MembershipApproved by the Governor - Chapter 47Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeElections (G1)
SB0936 / CH0206Cecil County - Sheriff and Orphans' Court Judges - SalaryApproved by the Governor - Chapter 206Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/2/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:32 P.M.