Cecil County Senators

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 5 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 5)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
SB0636
    (HB0284 / CH0607)
Cecil County - Office of the Sheriff - Employees and Collective BargainingVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
SB0637Correctional Services - Cecil County - Release and Home Detention ProgramsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB1057 / CH0067
    (HB0411 / CH0068)
Cecil County - Alcoholic Beverages - Alcohol Awareness ProgramApproved by the Governor - Chapter 67Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB1132
    (HB0379)
Creation of a State Debt - Cecil County - Bee Hive Colonial VillageIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 10:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 10:00 a.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB1133
    (HB0849)
Creation of a State Debt - Cecil County - Perryville Railroad Monument SignIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 10:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 10:00 a.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 29, 2018 3:55 P.M.