Charles County Delegation

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 5 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 5)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0172 / CH0085Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages Licensees - Nonalcoholic Items - Hours of SaleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 85Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0173Vehicle Laws - Charles County - Golf Cart ZonesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:15 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0653 / CH0631Charles County - Building Code - Abatement of ViolationsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 631Environmental Matters
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0995
    (SB0868)
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Children's Aid Society Building AdditionIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0997
    (SB0867)
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Melwood Recreation CenterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:27 P.M.