Charles County Delegation

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 10 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 10)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0209
    (SB0203 / CH0279)
Charles County - Board of Education - Salaries and ExpensesVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs By Request - CommitteeEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB0248 / CH0219Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer, Wine and Liquor LicensesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 219Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0300 / CH0095Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - LicensesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 95Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0344 / CH0395
    (SB0344)
Charles County - Sunday Car Sales Blue Law Exemption - Enabling AuthorityApproved by the Governor - Chapter 395Economic Matters
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings By Request - CommitteeBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0419 / CH0402Charles County - Off-Sale Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Population Quota in Sixth Election DistrictApproved by the Governor - Chapter 402Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0509
    (SB0529)
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Southern Maryland Carousel ProjectIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0519
    (SB0528)
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Lions Camp MerrickIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/8/2014 - 3:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0611
    (SB0526)
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Lifestyles Homeless Services CenterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/8/2014 - 3:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0914 / CH0243Charles County - Orphans' Court Judges - SalaryApproved by the Governor - Chapter 243Judiciary
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB0336Criminal Law - Coercion to Provide Sexually Explicit Images - PenaltiesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:32 P.M.