Charles County Delegation

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 11 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 11)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0125
    (SB1011)
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Indian Head Center for the Arts RenovationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/12/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0133 / CH0615Charles County - Annual Financial Report and Annual Audit Report - Filing DateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 615Environment and Transportation
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0137 / CH0097Charles County - Taxing Districts for Infrastructure Improvements - Repeal of RestrictionApproved by the Governor - Chapter 97Ways and Means
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0339Charles County - Property Tax Refunds - Accrual of InterestIn the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0372Criminal Law - Synthetic Drugs - PenaltiesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0414Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Charles County - Warrant Intercept ProgramIn the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0447 / CH0621Charles County - County Transfer Tax - Revenue Received by the Clerk of the Circuit CourtApproved by the Governor - Chapter 621Environment and Transportation
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Recordation and Transfer (Q6)
HB0505 / CH0670
    (SB0390 / CH0669)
Charles County Sheriff - Salaries and Collective BargainingEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 670Environment and Transportation
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Finance
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB0574Ji'Aire Lee Workgroup on the Protection of Adults With Mental Illness and Their ChildrenIn the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeFamily Law (D4)
HB0624Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Hospice House of Charles CountyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/12/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0957
    (SB0988)
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Maryland Veterans Memorial Museum Land AcquisitionIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/12/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:07 P.M.