Transportation, Department of

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 3 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 3)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0253 / CH0543Motor Vehicles - Automobile TransportersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 543Environment and Transportation
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalVehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
SB0038 / CH0526Motor Vehicle Administration – Birth Certificates – Issuance of CopiesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 526Finance
1/17/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalPublic Health (J1)
SB0039 / CH0041Motor Vehicle Administration - Disability Parking PlacardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 41Judicial Proceedings
1/18/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 11, 2018 4:29 P.M.