Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Com, Chair

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 17 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 17)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
SB0102Governor's Office for Children and Services to ChildrenIn the Senate - Rereferred to Finance (Senator Conway) AdoptedFinance
1/20/2016 - 3:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalChildren (O4)
SB0103
    (HB0446 / CH0620)
State Government - Maryland Youth Advisory Council - RevisionsIn the Senate - Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0104 / CH0018Housing and Community Development - Local Government Infrastructure Projects - FinancingEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 18Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalEconomic and Community Development (C8)
SB0105Northeast Maryland Waste Disposal Authority - Name and AuthorityIn the House - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0106 / CH0349Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - State Board of Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Contractors - Authority of the SecretaryApproved by the Governor - Chapter 349Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0107 / CH0047Military Department - Summary Courts-Martial - PenaltiesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 47Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalPublic Safety (E4)
SB0108 / CH0159Nurse Support Program Assistance Fund - RevisionsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 159Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/27/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
By Request - DepartmentalEducation - Miscellaneous (F5)
SB0109 / CH0048Health Occupations Boards - Criminal History Records Checks - RequiredApproved by the Governor - Chapter 48Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/27/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalHealth Occupations (J2)
SB0110 / CH0019Agriculture - Young Farmers Advisory Board - MembershipEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 19Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalAgriculture (M4)
SB0111 / CH0020State Lottery - Licensed Agents - Prize PaymentsEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 20Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalGaming (C7)
SB0112 / CH0021Pest Control Compact - RepealEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 21Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalAgriculture (M4)
SB0113 / CH0022Department of Agriculture - Bees, Bee Colonies, and Used Bee Equipment - Transportation and ShipmentEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 22Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalAgriculture (M4)
SB0281 / CH0062State Government - Members of the National Guard - Active Duty - Employment ProtectionApproved by the Governor - Chapter 62Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0282 / CH0185Early Childhood Development - Transfer of ProvisionsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 185Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0285 / CH0370Maryland Home Improvement Commission - Subcontractor Licensing Requirement - RepealApproved by the Governor - Chapter 370Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SJ0001 / JR0001Patuxent River Watershed - Amendment of Patuxent River Policy PlanSigned by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 1Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
4/1/2016 - 3:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalEnvironment (M3)
SB0200 / CH0359
    (HB0497 / CH0360)
Health Occupations - State Board of Environmental Health Specialists - Sunset Extension and RevisionsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 359Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherHealth Occupations (J2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:07 P.M.