Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Com, Chair

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 16 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 16)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
SB0008State Board of Nursing - Maryland Nurse Practice Act - RevisionsIn the Senate - Returned PassedEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/18/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalHealth Occupations (J2)
SB0040Maryland Stadium Authority - Exemption From Department of Information Technology OversightIn the Senate - Returned PassedEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/11/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalState Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0043
    (HB0193)
High School Diploma by Examination - Eligibility Requirements - ExemptionIn the Senate - Returned PassedFinance
1/16/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
Ways and Means
By Request - DepartmentalPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0058State Board for Certification of Residential Child Care Program Professionals - RevisionsIn the Senate - Returned PassedEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/18/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalHealth Occupations (J2)
SB0062Maryland Chiropractic Act - RevisionsIn the Senate - Passed EnrolledEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/18/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalHealth Occupations (J2)
SB0077 / CH0046
    (HB0188 / CH0045)
State Board of Architects and State Board for Professional Land Surveyors - MembershipApproved by the Governor - Chapter 46Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/11/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersBy Request - DepartmentalBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0080State Board of Occupational Therapy Practice - Licensure - RevisionsIn the Senate - Returned PassedEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/18/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalHealth Occupations (J2)
SB0085Tuition Waivers - Foster Care Recipients - EligibilityIn the Senate - Returned PassedEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/17/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalHigher Education (F2)
SB0089 / CH0060Chesapeake Bay and Coastal Zone Advisory Commission and Captive Wildlife Advisory Committee - RepealApproved by the Governor - Chapter 60Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0094Natural Resources – Unprotected Birds and MammalsIn the Senate - Passed EnrolledEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalHunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0100 / CH0063Reservoir, Dam, or Waterway Obstruction Plans - Designation of Approval AuthorityApproved by the Governor - Chapter 63Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalEnvironment (M3)
SB0106 / CH0048
    (HB0201 / CH0047)
State Board for Professional Engineers - Examination Requirements - Engineer-in-TrainingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 48Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/11/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersBy Request - DepartmentalBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0110State Board of Podiatric Medical Examiners – Licensure – Qualifications and ExaminationsIn the Senate - Returned PassedEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/18/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalHealth Occupations (J2)
SB0112 / CH0061Natural Resources - Tidal Fish LicensesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 61Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalHunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0113 / CH0062Natural Resources - Recreational License Incentive Discount ProgramApproved by the Governor - Chapter 62Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalHunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0552
    (HB0742)
State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationIn the Senate - Returned PassedEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherHealth Occupations (J2)

Denotes enacted legislation

April 18, 2018 4:14 P.M.