Environmental Matters Committee, Chair

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 8 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 8)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0011 / CH0080Environment - Bay Restoration Fund - Authorized UsesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 80Environmental Matters
1/29/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/14/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalEnvironment (M3)
HB0012 / CH0379Bay Restoration Fund - Authorized Uses - Local EntitiesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 379Environmental Matters
1/29/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalEnvironment (M3)
HB0346 / CH0098Maryland Historical Trust - Review of Capital Projects - Duties of DirectorApproved by the Governor - Chapter 98Environmental Matters
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0451 / CH0228Neighborhood Business Development Program - Financial Assistance for Food DesertsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 228Environmental Matters
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0453 / CH0229Housing and Community Development - Multifamily Rental Housing Programs Efficiency ActApproved by the Governor - Chapter 229Environmental Matters
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0517Board of Public Works - State Wetlands Licenses - Best Interest of the StateIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
2/12/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalEnvironment (M3)
HB0553 / CH0410Housing - Energy-Efficient Homes Construction Loan ProgramApproved by the Governor - Chapter 410Environmental Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0615 / CH0415Coast Smart CouncilApproved by the Governor - Chapter 415Environmental Matters
2/12/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalEnvironment (M3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:33 P.M.