Environment and Transportation Committee, Chair

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 11 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 11)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0061Environment - Solid Waste, Recycling, and Anaerobic DigestionIn the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Pinsky)Environment and Transportation
1/27/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalEnvironment (M3)
HB0062 / CH0085Natural Resources - Fishing and Hunting LicensesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 85Environment and Transportation
1/27/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0063 / CH0086Natural Resources - Fishing - Regulation and Use of Commercial Finfish TrotlinesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 86Environment and Transportation
1/27/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0065 / CH0087Tree Expert License - Application and Renewal - Repeal of Sunset ProvisionApproved by the Governor - Chapter 87Environment and Transportation
1/27/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0229 / CH0256Commercial Motor Vehicles - Operation - Transportation EmergenciesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 256Environment and Transportation
2/11/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalVehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB0325Environment - Bay Restoration Fund - Use of Funds - Nutrient Credit PurchasesIn the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalEnvironment (M3)
HB0326 / CH0482Housing and Community Development - Business Lending and Neighborhood RevitalizationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 482Environment and Transportation
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
By Request - DepartmentalEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0503 / CH0268Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Compact - Board of Directors - Appointing Authority for Federal MembersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 268Environment and Transportation
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalTransportation - Generally (R2)
HB0766 / CH0117Natural Resources - Fish and FisheriesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 117Environment and Transportation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0797 / CH0631Nontidal Wetlands - Nontidal Wetland Mitigation BankingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 631Environment and Transportation
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalEnvironment (M3)
HB1506Natural Resources - Wildlife and HuntingIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesEnvironment and Transportation
4/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesBy Request - DepartmentalHunting and Fishing (M2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:07 P.M.