Environment and Transportation Committee, Chair

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 7 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 1, By Request: 6)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0633 / CH0423
    (SB0578 / CH0424)
Secretary of State – Address Confidentiality Programs – Shielding of Real Property RecordsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 423Environment and Transportation
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCo-SponsorReal Property (N1)
HB0252 / CH0672Land Use - AgritourismApproved by the Governor - Chapter 672Environment and Transportation
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalAgriculture (M4)
HB0253 / CH0543Motor Vehicles - Automobile TransportersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 543Environment and Transportation
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalVehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)
HB0254Real Property - Ground Leases - Unlawful CollectionsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalReal Property (N1)
HB0255Secretary of State - Address Confidentiality Programs - Shielding of Real Property RecordsIn the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalReal Property (N1)
HB0279 / CH0104Housing and Community Development - Homebuyer Education RequirementsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 104Environment and Transportation
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0694 / CH0673Public Safety - Building Codes - Transfer of Administration to Department of Labor, Licensing, and RegulationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 673Environment and Transportation
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Judicial ProceedingsBy Request - DepartmentalPublic Safety (E4)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 18, 2018 4:07 P.M.