Finance Committee, Chair

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 22 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 22)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
SB0074 / CH0336Unemployment Insurance - Effect of Retirement Payments on Eligibility for Benefits - RevisionApproved by the Governor - Chapter 336Finance
1/19/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalUnemployment Insurance (K2)
SB0075 / CH0155Insurance - Public Adjusters - LicensingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 155Finance
1/14/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0084 / CH0337Unemployment Insurance - Calculation and Application of Table of Rates - RevisionApproved by the Governor - Chapter 337Finance
1/19/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalUnemployment Insurance (K2)
SB0085 / CH0338
    (HB0059)
Department of Economic Competitiveness and Commerce - Renaming and ReorganizationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 338Finance
1/21/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersBy Request - DepartmentalEconomic and Community Development (C8)
SB0086 / CH0339Unemployment Insurance - Exemption From Actively Seeking Work Requirement - RepealApproved by the Governor - Chapter 339Finance
1/19/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalUnemployment Insurance (K2)
SB0087 / CH0340Mortgage Loan Originators - State Criminal History Records Check Requirement - RepealApproved by the Governor - Chapter 340Finance
1/14/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalFinancial Institutions (I1)
SB0088 / CH0341Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Consolidation of Nondepository Special FundsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 341Finance
1/14/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalFinancial Institutions (I1)
SB0089Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Provision of Substance Use Services to Enrollees of Managed Care OrganizationsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceBy Request - DepartmentalPublic Health (J1)
SB0090 / CH0342Unemployment Insurance - Recovery of Benefits and Penalties for FraudApproved by the Governor - Chapter 342Finance
1/19/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalUnemployment Insurance (K2)
SB0091 / CH0046Public Health - State-Identified HIV PrioritiesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 46Finance
1/20/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalPublic Health (J1)
SB0092 / CH0343Planned Apprenticeship Standards and On-the-Job Training Activities - RevisionsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 343Finance
1/21/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0093 / CH0345Maryland Workforce Corporation and Health Care Personnel Training Fund - RepealApproved by the Governor - Chapter 345Finance
1/21/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0094 / CH0344Workforce Development - RevisionsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 344Finance
1/21/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0095 / CH0346Division of Workforce Development and Adult Learning - Adult Education and Literacy Services - RevisionsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 346Finance
1/21/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
By Request - DepartmentalPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0096 / CH0347Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation - State Collection Agency Licensing Board - Authority of the SecretaryApproved by the Governor - Chapter 347Finance
1/28/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0097 / CH0348
    (HB0468)
Public Health - Opioid-Associated Disease Prevention and Outreach ProgramsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 348Finance
1/28/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalPublic Health (J1)
SB0098 / CH0017Senior Citizen Activities Center Operating Fund - Distributions - AlterationEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 17Finance
1/21/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalElderly (O2)
SB0099 / CH0038Department of Disabilities - Assistive Technology Loan Program - Board of DirectorsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 38Finance
1/21/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalDisabled (O3)
SB0100Farm Labor Contracting - State License Requirement - RepealIn the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
1/28/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0101Maryland Transit Administration - Labor Relations - Resolution of Labor DisputesIn the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
1/28/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalTransportation - Generally (R2)
SB0114Health - Prohibition on Distribution of Tobacco Products and Electronic Smoking Devices to Minors - Civil EnforcementIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceBy Request - DepartmentalPublic Health (J1)
SB1109 / CH0468Division of Workforce Development and Adult Learning - Transfer of Senior Community Service Employment ProgramApproved by the Governor - Chapter 468Finance
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/6/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalElderly (O2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:07 P.M.