Finance Committee, Chair

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 18 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 18)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
SB0006
    (HB0187)
Financial Institutions - Nondepository Special Fund - ExpansionIn the House - First Reading Economic MattersFinance
1/17/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Economic MattersBy Request - DepartmentalFinancial Institutions (I1)
SB0017Health Information Exchanges - Definitions and RegulationsIn the Senate - Returned PassedFinance
1/18/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalHealth Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
SB0026State Agency Loan Program and Jane E. Lawton Conservation Loan Program - MergerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersFinance
1/11/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0038Motor Vehicle Administration – Birth Certificates – Issuance of CopiesIn the Senate - Returned PassedFinance
1/17/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalPublic Health (J1)
SB0043
    (HB0193)
High School Diploma by Examination - Eligibility Requirements - ExemptionIn the Senate - Returned PassedFinance
1/16/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
Ways and Means
By Request - DepartmentalPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0052Insurance - Medicare Supplement Policy Plans - Conformity to Federal LawIn the Senate - Returned PassedFinance
1/16/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalInsurance - Health (C3)
SB0054Health Insurance – Technical Corrections and Required Conformity With Federal LawIn the Senate - Returned PassedFinance
1/11/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalInsurance - Health (C3)
SB0057Insurance - Medical Professional Liability Insurance Policies - Technical CorrectionIn the Senate - Returned PassedFinance
1/11/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0059 / CH0042Insurance - Antifraud Plan Requirement - ApplicationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 42Finance
1/16/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalInsurance - Health (C3)
SB0064
    (HB0200)
State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors - MembershipIn the Senate - Passed EnrolledFinance
1/11/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Economic MattersBy Request - DepartmentalBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0067Department of Commerce - Maryland Economic Development Assistance Authority and Fund - Renaming and RevisingIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersFinance
1/18/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalEconomic and Community Development (C8)
SB0071 / CH0043Insurance - Certificates of Qualification for Surplus Lines Brokers - Suspensions and RevocationsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 43Finance
1/16/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0078Insurance - Risk Retention Groups - RevisionsIn the Senate - Returned PassedFinance
1/18/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalInsurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0087Controlled Dangerous Substances - Registration, Schedules, Penalties, and Orders of ImpoundmentIn the Senate - Passed EnrolledFinance
1/18/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalPublic Health (J1)
SB0097 / CH0051Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services - Disclosure of RecordsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 51Finance
1/16/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalUtility Regulation (C5)
SB0105State Advisory Council on Hereditary and Congenital Disorders – Membership and AppointmentsIn the Senate - Returned PassedFinance
1/11/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalPublic Health (J1)
SB0108Regulation of Health Care Programs, Medical Laboratories, Tissue Banks, and Health Care Facilities - RevisionsIn the Senate - Returned PassedFinance
1/18/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalHealth Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
SB0111Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Criminal History Records Checks - Contractors With Access to Federal Tax InformationIn the Senate - Returned PassedFinance
1/17/2018 - 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalInsurance - Health (C3)

Denotes enacted legislation

April 18, 2018 4:14 P.M.