Harford County Delegation

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 4 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 4)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0892 / CH0429
    (SB0795 / CH0428)
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Movie Theater LicenseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 429Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0969 / CH0285Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Business Establishments Near SchoolsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 285Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1051 / CH0449Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Community College LicenseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 449Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1581 / CH0012Harford County Deputy Sheriffs Dailey and Logsdon Benefits Memorial ActApproved by the Governor - Chapter 12Appropriations
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 9:00 a.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Pensions and Retirement (K4)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:07 P.M.