Howard County Delegation

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 9 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 9)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0145 / CH0072Howard County - Appointed Alcoholic Beverage Hearing Board - Compensation Ho. Co. 6-15Approved by the Governor - Chapter 72Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0204
    (SB0236)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Environmental Education Center Renovation and Expansion Ho. Co. 2-15In the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2015 - 10:00 a.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0205
    (SB0233)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Community Action Council Food Bank Facility Ho. Co. 4-15In the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2015 - 10:00 a.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0206
    (SB0234)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Howard County Historical Society Roof Repair Ho. Co. 9-15In the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2015 - 10:00 a.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0209Howard County - Room Rental Tax - Room Rental Fee Ho. Co. 12-15Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)Ways and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Miscellaneous - Local (Q8)
HB0424 / CH0090Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special Event - Education Permits Ho. Co. 05-15Approved by the Governor - Chapter 90Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0425 / CH0246Howard County - Casino Events - Authorized Ho. Co. 7-15Approved by the Governor - Chapter 246Ways and Means
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/7/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeGaming (C7)
HB0426
    (SB0235)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Historic Clover Hill Farm House Restoration Ho. Co. 10-15In the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/14/2015 - 10:00 a.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0440 / CH0248Howard County - Insurance - Certificates of Guarantee for County Bond Requirements Ho. Co. 8-15Approved by the Governor - Chapter 248Appropriations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeInsurance - Other than Health (C4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:39 P.M.