Howard County Delegation

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 16 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 16)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0223 / CH0138Howard County - Transfer Tax Exemption and Rate Reduction - Teachers Ho. Co. 13-18Approved by the Governor - Chapter 138Ways and Means
1/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Recordation and Transfer (Q6)
HB0337
    (SB0640)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - PHILLIPS School Commercial Kitchen Ho. Co. 1-18In the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 10:00 a.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0338
    (SB0641)
Creation of a State Debt – Howard County – Ellicott City Public Arts Project Ho. Co. 2–18In the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 10:00 a.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0339
    (SB0535)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Lisbon Volunteer Fire Department Ho. Co. 5-18In the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 10:00 a.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0340Howard County - Board of Education - Salaries Ho. Co. 17-18In the House - Returned PassedWays and Means
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB0341
    (SB0642)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Gateway Innovation Center Ho. Co. 3-18In the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 10:00 a.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0342Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class C BWL License Ho. Co. 21-18In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0343
    (SB0537)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Ellicott City Baltimore and Ohio Railroad Station Museum Ho. Co. 22-18In the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 10:00 a.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0397
    (SB0536)
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Barnard Fort House Ho. Co. 23-18In the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/10/2018 - 10:00 a.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0809Howard County - Sheriff's Salary Ho. Co. 8-18In the House - Returned PassedEnvironment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB1053 / CH0139Howard County – Class 7 Micro–Brewery License and Multiple Class B and Class BLX Beer, Wine, and Liquor Licenses Ho. Co. 06–18Approved by the Governor - Chapter 139Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1115Howard County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation Ho. Co. 7-18In the House - Returned PassedHealth and Government Operations
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeEstates and Trusts (N2)
HB1180 / CH0140Howard County Student Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Teachers Ho. Co. 14–18Approved by the Governor - Chapter 140Ways and Means
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB1186 / CH0141Howard County - Property Tax Credit - Natural Disaster Ho. Co. 09-18Approved by the Governor - Chapter 141Ways and Means
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Property (Q1)
HB1324Howard County Board of Education - Superintendent of Schools - Term Length Ho. Co. 11-18In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB1325 / CH0142Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class C License and Class C and Class D Per Diem Entertainment Venue Licenses Ho. Co. 20-18Approved by the Governor - Chapter 142Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)

Denotes enacted legislation

April 18, 2018 4:14 P.M.