Montgomery County Delegation

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 22 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 22)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0087 / CH0716Montgomery County Board of Education - Student Member - Voting MC 11-16Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 716Ways and Means
2/4/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB0204 / CH0007Montgomery County - Elections - Early Voting Centers MC 14-16Approved by the Governor - Chapter 7Ways and Means
1/27/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeElections (G1)
HB1029 / CH0641Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class BD-BWL License - Hours of Sale MC 17-16Approved by the Governor - Chapter 641Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1030Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Premises Near Schools, Places of Worship, and Youth Centers MC 1-16In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1032Montgomery County Board of Education - Elections - Voting by County Residents MC 25-16In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB1033Montgomery County - Purchases From the Department of Liquor Control - Exception for Wholesalers MC 7-16In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1064 / CH0292Montgomery County - Sale of Alcoholic Beverages - Distance From Places of Worship, Schools, and Youth Centers MC 18-16Approved by the Governor - Chapter 292Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1065Montgomery County Board of Education - Special Election to Fill a Vacancy MC 2-16In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB1066Montgomery County Public Schools - Communications in Spanish MC 37-16In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansBy Request - CommitteeEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB1067Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Exemption From Minimum Distance Restrictions MC 8-16In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1073 / CH0645Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Applications - Online Notice MC 5-16Approved by the Governor - Chapter 645Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1074 / CH0294Montgomery County - Laytonsville - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses MC 22-16Approved by the Governor - Chapter 294Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1075Montgomery County - Gaithersburg - Licensed Alcoholic Beverages Restaurants - Exemption From Distance Restrictions MC 23-16In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1076 / CH0646Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sports Stadium License MC 19-16Approved by the Governor - Chapter 646Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1077 / CH0295Montgomery County Board of Elections - Election Director - Appointment Requirement MC 26-16Approved by the Governor - Chapter 295Ways and Means
3/2/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeElections (G1)
HB1078Montgomery County - Property Tax - Homestead Tax Credit Percentage MC 28-16In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB1079 / CH0296Montgomery County Student Loan Refinancing Authority MC 27-16Approved by the Governor - Chapter 296Ways and Means
3/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationBy Request - CommitteeEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB1101 / CH0131Municipal Corporations - Closed Swimming Lake - Regulation MC 32-16Approved by the Governor - Chapter 131Environment and Transportation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeEnvironment (M3)
HB1115 / CH0732Montgomery County - Cigarette Retailers - County License Fee MC 12-16Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 732Economic Matters
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/6/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1116Montgomery County - Ranked Choice Voting MC 15-16In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 2:30 p.m.Ways and Means
3/2/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeElections (G1)
HB1146Montgomery County - Foreclosed Property Registry - Civil Penalty for Failure to Register MC 33-16In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationBy Request - CommitteeReal Property (N1)
HB1237Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class A Beer, Wine, and Liquor Licenses - Purchases From Licensed Wholesalers MC 3-16In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:08 P.M.