Montgomery County Senators

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 18 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 18)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
SB0298
    (HB0136 / CH0386)
Alcoholic Beverages - Montgomery County - Beer FestivalsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0299 / CH0482
    (HB0147)
Montgomery County - Maryland Tort Claims Act - Human Services TortsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 482Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0300 / CH0483
    (HB0142)
Montgomery County - Proportion of Food and Alcoholic Beverages Sales - Class B Licenses and Class B-BWL (H-M) LicensesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 483Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0301
    (HB0137 / CH0387)
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beauty Salon LicenseIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0302 / CH0289
    (HB0131)
Montgomery County - City of Takoma Park - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B On- and Off-Sale LicenseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 289Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0305 / CH0484
    (HB0132 / CH0485)
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer Sales and Delivery to Retail DealersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 484Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0306 / CH0054
    (HB0141)
Montgomery County - Barbershops - Restriction on Operation RepealedApproved by the Governor - Chapter 54Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Economic Matters By Request - CommitteeBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0307
    (HB0144 / CH0586)
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine and Liquor LicensesVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0308
    (HB0139)
Montgomery County - Law Enforcement Vehicles - Automated External DefibrillatorIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
By Request - CommitteePublic Safety (E4)
SB0309 / CH0290
    (HB0138)
Montgomery County - Archery Hunting - Safety ZoneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 290Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/2/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeHunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0310 / CH0055
    (HB0140)
Montgomery County - Micro-Brewery Licenses and Class D Beer and Light Wine LicensesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 55Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0311
    (HB0146 / CH0388)
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Special BWL Community Performing Arts Facility LicenseVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0312
    (HB0143)
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages Sales - Prohibition on Use of Self-Scanning Cash RegistersIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0313
    (HB0135 / CH0385)
Montgomery County - Town of Kensington - Alcoholic Beverages - Special B-K LicensesIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0459 / CH0504
    (HB0269)
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine and Liquor (Clubhouse/Lodge) LicenseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 504Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0657 / CH0324
    (HB0463)
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer, Wine and Liquor LicensesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 324Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
SB0815 / CH0197
    (HB0638)
Criminal Law - Telecommunication Devices in Place of Confinement - Montgomery County Work Release and Prerelease ProgramsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 197Judicial Proceedings
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB1025
    (HB0960)
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Residency Requirement ExemptionIn the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:33 P.M.