Montgomery County Delegation & Prince George's Co Deleg

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 9 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 9)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0319 / CH0562Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Office of Supplier Diversity and Inclusion and Minority Business Enterprise Program MC/PG 106-17Approved by the Governor - Chapter 562Health and Government Operations
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeBi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0320Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Connection Pipe Emergency Replacement Loan Program MC/PG 109-17In the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeBi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0321 / CH0361Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Audit Committee and Office of the Inspector General MC/PG 110-17Approved by the Governor - Chapter 361Environment and Transportation
3/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeBi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0322Prince George's County - Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Budget and Operation Study MC/PG 108-17In the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEnvironment and TransportationBy Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0323Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Prince George's County - Rezoning of the Jesuit Property MC/PG 107-17In the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEnvironment and TransportationBy Request - CommitteeBi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0326
    (SB0889)
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Prince George's County - Appointment Procedures MC/PG 105-17In the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEnvironment and TransportationBy Request - CommitteeBi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0335 / CH0563Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - System Development Charge - Exemptions MC/PG 104-17Approved by the Governor - Chapter 563Environment and Transportation
3/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeBi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0336Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Service Rates MC/PG 101-17In the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEnvironment and TransportationBy Request - CommitteeBi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0355 / CH0561Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Discrimination - Prohibited MC/PG 102-17Approved by the Governor - Chapter 561Health and Government Operations
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeBi-County Agencies (L5)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:20 P.M.