Pensions, Joint Committee on

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 10 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 10)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0164 / CH0248
    (SB0176 / CH0249)
Judges' Retirement System - Mandatory Retirement Age - Clarification of Eligibility for AllowanceApproved by the Governor - Chapter 248Appropriations
2/8/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2018 - 9:00 a.m.
By Request - OtherState Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB1012 / CH0727
    (SB0899 / CH0728)
State Retirement and Pension System - Investment DivisionApproved by the Governor - Chapter 727Appropriations
2/22/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2018 - 9:00 a.m.
By Request - OtherState Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB1018 / CH0723
    (SB0784 / CH0724)
Pensions - Administrative and Operational Expenses - Limitation and CalculationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 723Appropriations
2/22/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2018 - 9:00 a.m.
By Request - OtherState Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB1019
    (SB0699 / CH0509)
Alternate Contributory Pension Selection - Former Members - Member ContributionsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
2/22/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2018 - 9:00 a.m.
By Request - OtherState Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB1020
    (SB0178)
State Retirement and Pension System - Board of Trustees - OathIn the House - Hearing 2/22 at 3:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/22/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherState Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0176 / CH0249
    (HB0164 / CH0248)
Judges' Retirement System - Mandatory Retirement Age - Clarification of Eligibility for AllowanceApproved by the Governor - Chapter 249Budget and Taxation
1/25/2018 - 9:30 a.m.
Appropriations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherState Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0178
    (HB1020)
State Retirement and Pension System – Board of Trustees – OathVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Budget and Taxation
1/25/2018 - 9:30 a.m.
Appropriations
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherState Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0699 / CH0509
    (HB1019)
Alternate Contributory Pension Selection – Former Members – Member ContributionsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 509Budget and Taxation
2/22/2018 - 8:30 a.m.
Appropriations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherState Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0784 / CH0724
    (HB1018 / CH0723)
Pensions - Administrative and Operational Expenses - Limitation and CalculationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 724Budget and Taxation
2/22/2018 - 8:30 a.m.
Appropriations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherState Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0899 / CH0728
    (HB1012 / CH0727)
State Retirement and Pension System - Investment DivisionApproved by the Governor - Chapter 728Budget and Taxation
2/22/2018 - 8:30 a.m.
Appropriations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherState Pensions and Retirement (K4)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 29, 2018 3:56 P.M.