Prince George's County Delegation

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 26 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 26)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0965Prince George's County - Raffles - Charitable Foundation Affiliated With Professional Football Team PG 303-14In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeGaming (C7)
HB0966Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Off-Sale Permit PG 304-14In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0976 / CH0245Prince George's County - State's Attorney - Salary PG 310-14Approved by the Governor - Chapter 245Environmental Matters
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCourts and Court Personnel - Local (D2)
HB0978Prince George's County - Gaming - Charity Chips PG 307-14In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeGaming (C7)
HB0980Transportation - Roadway Near High Voltage Electric Transmission Line in Prince George's County - Limitation PG 407-14In the House - First Reading Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters By Request - CommitteeTransportation - Highways (R1)
HB0994Task Force on the Creation of a Juvenile Assessment Center and Constructive Alternatives to Managing Youth at Risk of Delinquency in Prince George's County PG 306-14In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary By Request - CommitteeJuvenile Law (E3)
HB1000Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Transfer of Beer, Wine or Liquor Licenses - Repeal of Prohibition PG 301-14In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/17/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1012Prince George's County - Property Tax Credit - Qualified Residential Property PG 414-14In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB1013Prince George's County Board of Education - Public High Schools - Outdoor Synthetic Turf Fields PG 409-14In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB1017 / CH0437Prince George's County - Board of Education - Elected Member Vacancy - Approval of Appointment PG 422-14Approved by the Governor - Chapter 437Ways and Means
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB1019 / CH0632Prince George's County - Adults With Developmental Disabilities Citizen's Advisory Committee - Sunset Repeal PG 421-14Approved by the Governor - Chapter 632Health and Government Operations
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteePublic Health (J1)
HB1021Prince George's County - Foreclosure - Report by Department of Housing and Community Development and Commissioner of Financial Regulation PG 411-14In the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesEnvironmental Matters
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules By Request - CommitteeReal Property (N1)
HB1022Howard County and Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Membership and Compensation of Boards PG 309-14In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1027Prince George's County - Condominiums - Limit on Assessments PG 419-14In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters By Request - CommitteeReal Property (N1)
HB1028Prince George's County - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - Report on County Funding Plan PG 417-14In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1035 / CH0439Prince George's County Juvenile Court and School Safety Workgroup - Membership and Duties PG 305-14Approved by the Governor - Chapter 439Ways and Means
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeJuvenile Law (E3)
HB1043 / CH0441Prince George's County - Deferred Water and Sewer Charges Homeowner Disclosure Act of 2014 PG 413-14Approved by the Governor - Chapter 441Environmental Matters
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeBi-County Agencies (L5)
HB1044Prince George's County - Election Law - Polling Places - Accommodations for Disabled Voters PG 410-14In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeElections (G1)
HB1046 / CH0635City of College Park Employees - Participation in the Employees' Pension System PG 404-14Approved by the Governor - Chapter 635Appropriations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2014 - 9:00 a.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB1047 / CH0636Employees' Pension System - Prince George's County Officials - Membership PG 418-14Approved by the Governor - Chapter 636Appropriations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2014 - 9:00 a.m.
By Request - CommitteeState Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB1048 / CH0637Prince George's County - School Facilities Surcharge Exemption - Capitol College Student Housing and Residential Revitalization Projects PG 408-14Approved by the Governor - Chapter 637Environmental Matters
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1049Prince George's County - Authority to Impose Fees for Use of Disposable Bags PG 402-14In the House - First Reading Environmental Matters and Economic MattersEnvironmental Matters
Economic Matters
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1055Prince George's County - Board of Education - Issuance of Credit Cards - Prohibition PG 415-14In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB1057 / CH0442Prince George's County - University of Maryland, College Park Bus Service - Motor Carrier Permit Exemption - Removal of Sunset PG 403-14Approved by the Governor - Chapter 442Economic Matters
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeUtility Regulation (C5)
HB1061Transportation - Interstate 95 Link to Roadways or Property Near the University of Maryland, College Park - Spending Prohibited PG 406-14In the House - First Reading Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters By Request - CommitteeTransportation - Highways (R1)
HB1320College Park Student Housing Subsidy Reduction Act PG 405-14In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:33 P.M.