Prince George's County Delegation

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 29 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 29)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB1017 / CH0369
    (SB0256 / CH0368)
Prince George's County - Property Tax Deferrals - Elderly and Disabled Homeowners PG 412-16Approved by the Governor - Chapter 369Ways and Means
3/2/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB1018Prince George's County - Closures or Partial Closures of Hospitals - Board of Health Approval PG 406-16In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeHealth Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB1020 / CH0640Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Class B-WPL (Waterfront Pavilion) Beer, Wine, and Liquor License PG 314-16Approved by the Governor - Chapter 640Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1021 / CH0730Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses, Notice Requirements, and Loitering Enforcement PG 303-16Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 730Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1022Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class D (Waterfront) Beer, Wine, and Liquor License PG 315-16In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1069 / CH0293Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Entertainment Concessionaire and Facility Licenses PG 311-16Approved by the Governor - Chapter 293Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1082Prince George's County - Property Tax Bill - Statement of Lien PG 433-16In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansBy Request - CommitteeTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB1083Prince George's County - Abandoned Property - Special Property Tax Rate PG 432-16In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
3/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB1084Prince George's County - Public Schools - Reporting on Financial Management Practice Audits PG 423-16In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansBy Request - CommitteeEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB1085Prince George's County - State and County Transfer Taxes - Exemptions PG 429-16In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Recordation and Transfer (Q6)
HB1086Prince George's County Public Schools - Office of the Inspector General - Establishment PG 421-16In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansBy Request - CommitteeEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB1087 / CH0647Task Force to Study a Promise Scholarship Program in Prince George's County PG 438-16Approved by the Governor - Chapter 647Ways and Means
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteePrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1094Prince George's County - Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Use of Local Impact Grants PG 313-16In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and TaxationWays and Means
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeGaming (C7)
HB1126Prince George's County Pretrial Release, Work Release, and Diversion Programs Task Force PG 307-16In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsBy Request - CommitteePublic Safety (E4)
HB1127 / CH0298Prince George's County - Dissemination of Voter Information Material - Multifamily Residential Structures PG 408-16Approved by the Governor - Chapter 298Ways and Means
3/2/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeElections (G1)
HB1130Prince George's County - Authority to Impose Fees for Use of Disposable Bags PG 404-16In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic MattersEnvironment and Transportation
Economic Matters
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1134Equality in Education Act PG 434-16In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansBy Request - CommitteeEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB1135 / CH0299Prince George's County - Board of License Commissioners - Budget and Funding PG 308-16Approved by the Governor - Chapter 299Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1136Prince George's County - Alternatives to Suspension Pilot Program - Establishment PG 422-16In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansBy Request - CommitteeEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB1137Prince George's County - Authority to Prohibit the Use of Disposable Bags PG 418-16In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic MattersEnvironment and Transportation
Economic Matters
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1138 / CH0733
    (SB0780)
Prince George's County - School Facilities Surcharge - Student Housing Exemptions PG 439-16Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 733Environment and Transportation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1141Prince George's County - County Employees - Taxation and Retirement PG 437-16In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB1153Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Limited Auction and Foreclosure for Abandoned Property PG 431-16In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/2/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB1199Prince George's County - Emergency Medical Services - Motorcycle Unit PG 312-16In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteePublic Safety (E4)
HB1200Prince George's County - Community-Based Developmental Disabilities Services Providers - County Minimum Wage Reimbursement PG 414-16In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteePublic Health (J1)
HB1309Prince George's County - Class D Beer and Light Wine License - Permit PG 309-16In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1310Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses, License Fees, and Sunday Sales PG 301-16In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1311 / CH0307Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Development District Licenses and Sunday Off-Sale Permits PG 305-16Approved by the Governor - Chapter 307Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1486Workgroup on Transportation for Middle and High School Students in Prince George's County PG 440-16In the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTransportation - Generally (R2)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:09 P.M.