President, The

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 26 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 26)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
SB0134 / CH0001
    (HB0119)
Maryland Health Insurance Plan - Access for Bridge Eligible IndividualsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 1Finance
1/14/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations By Request - AdministrationInsurance - Health (C3)
SB0170 / CH0462
    (HB0160)
Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2015)Enacted under Article III, Section 52(6) of the Maryland Constitution Assigned a chapter number - Chapter 462Budget and Taxation Appropriations By Request - AdministrationOperating Budget (B1)
SB0171 / CH0463
    (HB0161)
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2014, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2005, 2006, 2007, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2011, 2012, and 2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 463Budget and Taxation Appropriations By Request - AdministrationCapital Budget (B5)
SB0172 / CH0464
    (HB0162)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014Approved by the Governor - Chapter 464Budget and Taxation
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations By Request - AdministrationOperating Budget (B1)
SB0218 / CH0475
    (HB0190)
Creation of a State Debt - Qualified Zone Academy BondsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 475Budget and Taxation
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations By Request - AdministrationState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0331
    (HB0295 / CH0262)
Maryland Minimum Wage Act of 2014In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 12:00 p.m. (Finance)Finance
2/17/2014 - 12:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
By Request - AdministrationPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0332 / CH0002
    (HB0297)
Prekindergarten Expansion Act of 2014Approved by the Governor - Chapter 2Budget and Taxation
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0333 / CH0111
    (HB0307 / CH0112)
Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Burden of ProofApproved by the Governor - Chapter 111Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationFamily Law (D4)
SB0334 / CH0113
    (HB0309 / CH0114)
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Final Protective OrdersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 113Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationFamily Law (D4)
SB0335
    (HB0298 / CH0263)
Health Services Cost Review Commission - Powers and Duties, Regulation of Facilities, and Maryland All-Payer Model ContractIn the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationHealth Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
SB0336
    (HB0296 / CH0465)
Natural Resources - Wildlands - Designation of New WildlandsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0337 / CH0115
    (HB0306 / CH0116)
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - PenaltiesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 115Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0338 / CH0117
    (HB0308)
Public Safety - Statewide Interoperability Radio Control Board - EstablishedApproved by the Governor - Chapter 117Finance
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
By Request - AdministrationPublic Safety (E4)
SB0167
    (HB0120)
Judgeships - Circuit Courts and District CourtIn the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)Judicial Proceedings
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
By Request - OtherCourts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0183 / CH0044Annual Curative BillApproved by the Governor - Chapter 44Rules Rules and Executive Nominations
2/17/2014 - 4:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherState Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0184 / CH0045Annual Corrective BillApproved by the Governor - Chapter 45Rules Rules and Executive Nominations
2/17/2014 - 4:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherState Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0235 / CH0477
    (HB0231)
Governor - Pension and Health BenefitsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 477Budget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/31/2014 - 3:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherState Pensions and Retirement (K4)
SB0236 / CH0283
    (HB0230)
Constitutional Officers - SalariesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 283Budget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
4/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0292 / CH0051
    (HB0253)
State Board of Stationary Engineers - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 51Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters By Request - OtherBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0293 / CH0288
    (HB0257)
Elevator Safety Review Board and Division of Labor and Industry - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 288Finance
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters By Request - OtherBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0294 / CH0052
    (HB0256)
Maryland Horse Industry Board - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 52Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherAgriculture (M4)
SB0295
    (HB0258 / CH0093)
State Board of Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech-Language Pathologists - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/29/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherHealth Occupations (J2)
SB0296
    (HB0255 / CH0092)
Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherPublic Health (J1)
SB0297 / CH0053
    (HB0254)
State Board of Individual Tax Preparers - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 53Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters By Request - OtherBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0602
    (HB0739 / CH0612)
Maryland Estate Tax - Unified CreditIn the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherTaxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
SJ0003 / JR0001
    (HJ0003 / JR0002)
Governor's Salary Commission - Salary Recommendations for Governor and Lieutenant GovernorEnacted under Article II, Section 21A(d) of the Maryland Constitution Assigned a resolution number - Joint Resolution 1Budget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
By Request - OtherState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:33 P.M.