President, The

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 23 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 23)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
SB0055
    (HB0070 / CH0310)
Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2016)In the Senate - First Reading Budget and TaxationBudget and TaxationBy Request - AdministrationOperating Budget (B1)
SB0056
    (HB0071 / CH0495)
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2015, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2004, 2005, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2011, 2012, 2013, and 2014In the Senate - First Reading Budget and TaxationBudget and TaxationBy Request - AdministrationCapital Budget (B5)
SB0057
    (HB0072 / CH0489)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationOperating Budget (B1)
SB0079
    (HB0110 / CH0401)
Creation of a State Debt - Qualified Zone Academy BondsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0588
    (HB0481)
Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - RepealIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationEnvironment (M3)
SB0589
    (HB0483)
Motorist Tax Relief - Motor Fuel Tax - Consumer Price Index and Sales and Use Tax Equivalent Rate Adjustments - RepealIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationTaxes - Transportation (Q5)
SB0590
    (HB0480)
Small Business Personal Property Tax Relief Act of 2015In the House - Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/8/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationTaxes - Property (Q1)
SB0591
    (HB0484)
Transportation - Highway User Revenues - Phased RestorationIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationTransportation - Highways (R1)
SB0592 / CH0125
    (HB0482)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement Income - Individuals at Least 65 Years OldApproved by the Governor - Chapter 125Budget and Taxation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/8/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationTaxes - Income (Q3)
SB0593
    (HB0485 / CH0312)
Election Law - Fair Campaign Financing Fund - Income Tax CheckoffIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
By Request - AdministrationElections (G1)
SB0594
    (HB0488)
Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Law Enforcement, Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services Personnel (Hometown Heroes Act)In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationTaxes - Income (Q3)
SB0595 / CH0311
    (HB0486)
Public Charter School Improvement Act of 2015Approved by the Governor - Chapter 311Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
4/9/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0059
    (HB0068 / CH0059)
State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
2/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherHealth Occupations (J2)
SB0220
    (HB0067 / CH0058)
General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State AgenciesVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Rules
2/17/2015 - 11:00 a.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0222 / CH0021Annual Curative BillApproved by the Governor - Chapter 21Rules
2/11/2015 - 11:00 a.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/9/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherState Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0223 / CH0022Annual Corrective BillApproved by the Governor - Chapter 22Rules
2/11/2015 - 11:00 a.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/9/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherState Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0332
    (HB0111)
Judgeships - Circuit Courts and District CourtIn the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
By Request - OtherCourts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
SB0374 / CH0165
    (HB0405)
Maryland False Claims ActApproved by the Governor - Chapter 165Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0772
    (HB0942 / CH0140)
Apprenticeship Pilot Program - Apprenticeship MarylandIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m. (Finance)Finance
3/9/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
By Request - OtherEconomic and Community Development (C8)
SB0773
    (HB0941 / CH0139)
Task Force to Study Exemptions from Higher Education Ethics Requirements and Procurement Rules to Facilitate Technology TransferIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m. (Finance)Finance
3/9/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
By Request - OtherEconomic and Community Development (C8)
SB0774
    (HB0940 / CH0138)
Office of the Business Ombudsman - State Customer Service and Business Development Efforts Training ProgramIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.Finance
3/9/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherEconomic and Community Development (C8)
SB0775
    (HB0939 / CH0137)
Proposed Regulations - Determination of Impact on Small BusinessesIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.Finance
3/9/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherState Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0776
    (HB0943 / CH0141)
Economic Competitiveness and Commerce - RestructuringIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.Finance
3/9/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherEconomic and Community Development (C8)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:40 P.M.