St. Mary's County Delegation

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 6 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 6)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0105 / CH0106St. Mary's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Per Diem Beer License FeeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 106Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0107 / CH0107St. Mary's County - Leonardtown - Disposition of Alcoholic Beverages Licenses FeesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 107Economic Matters
2/19/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0110 / CH0741St. Mary's County - Inmate Release ProgramsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 741Judiciary
1/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0136St. Mary's County - Board of Library TrusteesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
2/1/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeEducation - Miscellaneous (F5)
HB0275 / CH0108St. Mary's County - Metropolitan CommissionApproved by the Governor - Chapter 108Environment and Transportation
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0331 / CH0109St. Mary's County - Public Facility BondsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 109Appropriations
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeLocal Debt (Bond Bills) (B3)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 21, 2018 10:38 A.M.