Speaker, The

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 22 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 22)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0070 / CH0310
    (SB0055)
Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2016)Enacted under Article III, Section 52(6) of the Maryland Constitution Assigned a chapter number - Chapter 310AppropriationsBudget and TaxationBy Request - AdministrationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0071 / CH0495
    (SB0056)
Creation of a State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2015, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2004, 2005, 2006, 2007, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2011, 2012, 2013, and 2014Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 495 (Line Item Veto)AppropriationsBudget and TaxationBy Request - AdministrationCapital Budget (B5)
HB0072 / CH0489
    (SB0057)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489Appropriations
3/3/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationBy Request - AdministrationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0110 / CH0401
    (SB0079)
Creation of a State Debt - Qualified Zone Academy BondsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 401Appropriations
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationBy Request - AdministrationState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0480
    (SB0590)
Small Business Personal Property Tax Relief Act of 2015In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationTaxes - Property (Q1)
HB0481
    (SB0588)
Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - RepealIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationEnvironment (M3)
HB0482
    (SB0592 / CH0125)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Military Retirement IncomeIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0483
    (SB0589)
Motorist Tax Relief - Motor Fuel Tax - Consumer Price Index and Sales and Use Tax Equivalent Rate Adjustments - RepealIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationTaxes - Transportation (Q5)
HB0484
    (SB0591)
Transportation - Highway User Revenues - Phased RestorationIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationTransportation - Highways (R1)
HB0485 / CH0312
    (SB0593)
Election Law - Fair Campaign Financing Fund - Income Tax CheckoffApproved by the Governor - Chapter 312Ways and Means
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
By Request - AdministrationElections (G1)
HB0486
    (SB0595 / CH0311)
Public Charter School Expansion and Improvement Act of 2015In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0487Maryland Education CreditIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0488
    (SB0594)
Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Law Enforcement, Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services Personnel (Hometown Heroes Act)In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0067 / CH0058
    (SB0220)
General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State AgenciesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 58Health and Government Operations
2/4/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
RulesBy Request - OtherState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0068 / CH0059
    (SB0059)
State Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 59Health and Government Operations
2/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0111
    (SB0332)
Judgeships - Circuit Courts and District CourtIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsBy Request - OtherCourts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB0405
    (SB0374 / CH0165)
Maryland False Claims ActVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsBy Request - OtherCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0939 / CH0137
    (SB0775)
Proposed Regulations - Determination of Impact on Small BusinessesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 137Economic Matters
3/9/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
FinanceBy Request - OtherState Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0940 / CH0138
    (SB0774)
Office of the Business Ombudsman - State Customer Service and Business Development Efforts Training ProgramApproved by the Governor - Chapter 138Economic Matters
3/9/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
FinanceBy Request - OtherEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0941 / CH0139
    (SB0773)
Task Force to Study Exemptions from Higher Education Ethics Requirements and Procurement Rules to Facilitate Technology TransferApproved by the Governor - Chapter 139Economic Matters
3/9/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Finance
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
By Request - OtherEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0942 / CH0140
    (SB0772)
Apprenticeship Pilot Program - Apprenticeship MarylandApproved by the Governor - Chapter 140Economic Matters
3/9/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Finance
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
By Request - OtherEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0943 / CH0141
    (SB0776)
Economic Competitiveness and Commerce - RestructuringApproved by the Governor - Chapter 141Economic Matters
3/9/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
FinanceBy Request - OtherEconomic and Community Development (C8)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:40 P.M.