Speaker, The

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 27 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 27)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0119
    (SB0134 / CH0001)
Maryland Health Insurance Plan - Access for Bridge Eligible IndividualsIn the House - Hearing 1/14 at 12:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
1/14/2014 - 12:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationInsurance - Health (C3)
HB0160
    (SB0170 / CH0462)
Budget Bill (Fiscal Year 2015)In the House - First Reading AppropriationsAppropriations By Request - AdministrationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0161
    (SB0171 / CH0463)
Creation of State Debt - Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2014, and the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2005, 2007, 2008, 2009, 2010, 2011, 2012, and 2013In the House - First Reading AppropriationsAppropriations By Request - AdministrationCapital Budget (B5)
HB0162
    (SB0172 / CH0464)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0190
    (SB0218 / CH0475)
Creation of a State Debt - Qualified Zone Academy BondsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0295 / CH0262
    (SB0331)
Maryland Minimum Wage Act of 2014Approved by the Governor - Chapter 262Economic Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
By Request - AdministrationPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0296 / CH0465
    (SB0336)
Natural Resources - Wildlands - Designation of New WildlandsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 465Environmental Matters
2/5/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs By Request - AdministrationNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0297
    (SB0332 / CH0002)
Prekindergarten Expansion Act of 2014Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
By Request - AdministrationPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0298 / CH0263
    (SB0335)
Health Services Cost Review Commission - Powers and Duties, Regulation of Facilities, and Maryland All-Payer Model ContractApproved by the Governor - Chapter 263Health and Government Operations
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationHealth Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB0306 / CH0116
    (SB0337 / CH0115)
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - PenaltiesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 116Judiciary
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings By Request - AdministrationCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0307 / CH0112
    (SB0333 / CH0111)
Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Burden of ProofApproved by the Governor - Chapter 112Judiciary
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings By Request - AdministrationFamily Law (D4)
HB0308
    (SB0338 / CH0117)
Public Safety - Statewide Interoperability Radio Control Board - EstablishedVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Finance
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - AdministrationPublic Safety (E4)
HB0309 / CH0114
    (SB0334 / CH0113)
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Final Protective OrdersApproved by the Governor - Chapter 114Judiciary
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings By Request - AdministrationFamily Law (D4)
HB0120
    (SB0167)
Judgeships - Circuit Courts and District CourtIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and TaxationJudiciary
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Budget and Taxation
By Request - OtherCourts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)
HB0230
    (SB0236 / CH0283)
Constitutional Officers - SalariesIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
2/24/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0231
    (SB0235 / CH0477)
Governor - Pension and Health BenefitsIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
2/24/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherState Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB0253
    (SB0292 / CH0051)
State Board of Stationary Engineers - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs By Request - OtherBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0254
    (SB0297 / CH0053)
State Board of Individual Tax Preparers - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs By Request - OtherBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0255 / CH0092
    (SB0296)
Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 92Health and Government Operations
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherPublic Health (J1)
HB0256
    (SB0294 / CH0052)
Maryland Horse Industry Board - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environmental Matters
2/5/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs By Request - OtherAgriculture (M4)
HB0257
    (SB0293 / CH0288)
Elevator Safety Review Board and Division of Labor and Industry - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0258 / CH0093
    (SB0295)
State Board of Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech-Language Pathologists - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 93Health and Government Operations
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs By Request - OtherHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0270 / CH0094General Provisions ArticleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 94Health and Government Operations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0739 / CH0612
    (SB0602)
Maryland Estate Tax - Unified CreditApproved by the Governor - Chapter 612Ways and Means
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation By Request - OtherTaxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
HB0969 / CH0104General Provisions - Cross-References and CorrectionsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 104Health and Government Operations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0999 / CH0106Code Revision - Miscellaneous ProvisionsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 106Health and Government Operations
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherState Government - General Assembly (P5)
HJ0003 / JR0002
    (SJ0003 / JR0001)
Governor's Salary Commission - Salary Recommendations for Governor and Lieutenant GovernorEnacted under Article II, Section 21A(d) of the Maryland Constitution Assigned a resolution number - Joint Resolution 2Rules and Executive Nominations
2/24/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:33 P.M.