Ways and Means Committee, Chair

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 6 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 6)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0475Public School Labor Relations - Renegotiation Procedures and Board AdministrationIn the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalEducation - Miscellaneous (F5)
HB0613 / CH0624Sustainable Communities - Designation and FinancingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 624Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Budget and Taxation
4/2/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalEconomic and Community Development (C8)
HB0750Maryland Veterans Trust Fund - Income Tax CheckoffIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0751Income Tax Credit - Maryland Qualified Research and Development Expenses - Credit AmountsIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0752 / CH0137Video Lottery Gaming - Term of LicenseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 137Ways and Means
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalGaming (C7)
HB0803 / CH0390Income Tax - Business and Economic Development - Cybersecurity Investment Incentive Tax CreditApproved by the Governor - Chapter 390Ways and Means
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/2/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalTaxes - Income (Q3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:28 P.M.