Ways and Means Committee, Chair

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 10 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 10)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0127 / CH0384Central Collection Unit - Debt Certification - Withholding of Income Tax RefundsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 384Ways and Means
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2014 - 1:30 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0454 / CH0230Gaming - Emergency Suspension of LicenseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 230Ways and Means
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2014 - 1:30 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalGaming (C7)
HB0459 / CH0099Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Physicians and Physician AssistantsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 99Ways and Means
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalHigher Education (F2)
HB0460 / CH0231Gaming - Background InvestigationsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 231Ways and Means
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2014 - 1:30 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalGaming (C7)
HB0461 / CH0232State Early Childhood Advisory CouncilApproved by the Governor - Chapter 232Ways and Means
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0465State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency - Raffles - AuthorizedIn the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalGaming (C7)
HB0510 / CH0601Sustainable Communities Tax Credit Program - Extension and AlterationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 601Ways and Means
2/14/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0520
    (SB1051)
Business and Economic Development - Film Production Activity Tax Credit ProgramIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/14/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0616Income Tax Credit - Qualified Research and Development Expenses - Credit AmountsIn the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB0988 / CH0434
    (SB0527)
Maryland Horse Racing Act - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 434Ways and Means
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - OtherHorse Racing (C6)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:34 P.M.