Former Delegate David G. Boschert

District 33A


Delegate David G. Boschert
TenureMember of the House of Delegates December 1982 and January 13, 1999 to January 10, 2007, representing District 33A, Anne Arundel County
Party Affiliation
Republican
Past House Service
2003-2007
Ways and Means Committee
1999-2003
Judiciary Committee
1999-2007
Special Committee on Drug and Alcohol Abuse
2003-2004
Special Committee on Higher Education Affordability and Accessibilty
Biographical Information
Born in Annapolis, Maryland, July 30, 1947
Anne Arundel Community College, A.A. Political Science 1978
University of Maryland, B.S. Business Management 1981
Captain (retired) U.S. Marine Corp Reserve 1967-1970, 1981-1993 (served in Vietnam 1969)
Married, two children
Died in Crownsville, Maryland, June 30, 2011

December 4, 2017 3:16 P.M.