Former Delegate Will Campos

District 47B


Delegate Will Campos
TenureFirst elected to the Maryland House of Delegates in 2014. Member since 2015. Resigned effective October 29, 2015. Carlo Alberto Sanchez appointed October 9, 2015. Sworn in October 30, 2015.
Party Affiliation
Democrat
Past House Service
2015
Judiciary Committee
2015
Family Law Subcommittee of the Judiciary Committee
2015
Civil Law and Procedure Subcommittee of the Judiciary Committee
2015
Secretary, Maryland Legislative Latino Caucus
Public Service
2004
Bi-County Task Force on Gang Activity
2004-2014
Prince George's County Board of Health
2006-2014
Prince George's County, Social Services Board
2006-2011
Metropolitan Washington Air Quality Committee
2006-2014
Human Services and Public Safety Policy Committee
2012-2014
Climate, Energy and Environment Policy Committee, Metropolitan Washington Council of Governments
2008-2009
Task Force on the Establishment of Vocational and Technical Education High School Academies in Prince George's County
Awards
2013-
Civic Leadership Award, Prince George's Community Foundation
Biographical Information
Born, October 7, 1974
Eleanor Roosevelt High School, Greenbelt, Maryland
University of Maryland, College Park, B.A. , Ancient Art History & Archaeology
University of Maryland, University College, B.S. Computer Studies & Information Systems
Prince George's County Council, Member, 2004-2014
Married

December 4, 2017 3:16 P.M.