Former Senator Joseph J. Curran, Jr.

District 43


Senator Joseph J. Curran, Jr.
TenureMember of the Senate January 2, 1963 to January 12, 1983, representing District 3, Baltimore City (1963-1966) and District 43, Baltimore City (1966-1983) Member of the House of Delegates January 7, 1959 to January 2, 1963, representing District 3, Baltimore City
Party Affiliation
Democrat
Past Senate Service
1965-1983
Judicial Proceedings Committee (Chair 1967-1983)
1967-1974
Rules Committee
1965-1966
Executive Nominations Committee
1967-1983
Legislative Policy Committee
1965-1966
Education Committee
1965-1966
Committee on Taxation and Fiscal Matters
1965-1966
Veterans and Civil Defense Committee
1965-1966
Public Utilities Committee (Chair)
Biographical Information
Past Senate Service Continued: 1963-1965 Public Utilities Committee (Chair)
Past House Service: Banking, Insurance and Social Security Committee 1959-1963; Education Committee 1959-1963
Born in West Palm Beach, Florida, July 7, 1931
University of Baltimore
Served in U.S. Air Force 1951-1955
University of Baltimore School of Law, LL.B. 1959
Admitted to Maryland Bar 1959
Lieutenant Governor of Maryland January 19, 1983 to January 21, 1987
Attorney General of Maryland January 1987 to January 2, 2007
Married, five children

December 4, 2017 3:16 P.M.