Former Senator Diane DeCarlo

District 6


Senator Diane DeCarlo
TenureMember of the Senate July 24, 2002 to January 8, 2003, representing District 6, Baltimore and Harford Counties Member of the House of Delegates January 11, 1995 to July 24, 2002 representing District 6, Baltimore and Harford Counties
Party Affiliation
Democrat
Past Senate Service
2002-2003
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
Past House Service
1995-2002
Commerce and Government Matters Committee
Biographical Information
Born in Brooklyn, New York November 12, 1945
Widow, two children

December 4, 2017 3:16 P.M.