Former Senator Joseph M. Getty

District 5


Senator Joseph M. Getty
TenureMember of the House of Delegates, January 11, 1995 to January 8, 2003, representing District 5, Carroll County First elected to the Senate in 2010. Member of the Senate from January 12, 2011 to January 23, 2015. Resigned from the Senate January 23, 2015. Represented District 5, Carroll County, 2011- 2014, and Carroll and Baltimore Counties beginning in 2015.
Party Affiliation
Republican
Past Senate Service
2015
Education, Business, and Administration Subcommittee, Budget and Taxation Committee
2013-2015
Budget and Taxation Committee
2015
Pensions Subcommittee, Budget and Taxation Committee
2013-2014
Minority Whip
2014
Executive Nominations Committee
2014
Legislative Policy Committee
2014
Joint Audit Committee
2013-2014
Spending Affordability Committee
2011-2014
Joint Committee on Transparency and Open Government
2013-2014
Special Committee on Ethics Reform
2012-2014
Task Force to Study Court Decision Regarding Pit Bulls
2011-2013
Judicial Proceedings Committee
2011-2012
Senate Standing Committee on Reapportionment and Redistricting
2011-2014
Joint Committee on Legislative Ethics
2012-2014
Task Force to Study the Laws and Policies Relating to Representation of Indigent Criminal Defendants by the Office of the Public Defender
2014
Chair, Senate Select Committee No. 2, Carroll County
Past House Service
1999-2003
Judiciary Committee
1999-2003
Family and Juvenile Law Subcommittee of the Judiciary Committee
1999-2002
Deputy Minority Whip
1995-1998
Commerce and Government Matters Committee
1995-1998
State Government and Civil Rights Subcommittee of the Commerce and Government Matters Committee
Public Service
2004-2006
Social Studies Task Force, State Department of Education
2003, 1991-1992
Chair, Carroll County Republican Central Committee
1999-2003
Article 27 (Crimes and Punishments) Revision Committee
2001-2002
Committee on Access to Court Records
2000-2001
Forensic Sciences Task Force
1996-1997
Commission to Revise the Election Code
1995
Task Force to Review the State's Election Law
1990-1994
Legislative Committee, Carroll County Chamber of Commerce
1987-1994
Executive Director, Historical Society of Carroll County
1985-1994, 1985-1994
Carroll County Republican Central Committee
1989-1993
Cable Television Advisory Committee, Carroll County
1992
Charter Board, Carroll County
1992
Chair, Carroll County Historic District Commission
1989-1992
Carroll County Historic District Commission
1990-
Rural Historic Village Protection Program Advisory Committee of Maryland Environmental Trust
1983-1984
Chair, Carroll County Committee for Maryland’s 350th Anniversary
1981-1982
Acting Director, Mid-Atlantic Regional Office, National Trust for Historic Preservation
Memberships
1996-
Maryland Bar Association (Section of Family and Juvenile Law; Section of Solo and Small Firm Practice)
1979-1992
Board of Governors, Union Mills Homestead Foundation
1984-1990
Board of Directors, Preservation Maryland
Biographical Information
Born, Olney, Maryland, April 14, 1952
Washington College, B.A., American Studies, 1974
University of Maryland School of Law, J.D., 1996
George Washington University, M.A., American Civilization, 1980
Political Director, Ehrlich for Governor, 2002
Director of Policy, Governor-Elect's Transition Team, 2002-03
Director of Policy, Office of the Governor, 2003
Policy and Legislative Director, Office of the Governor, 2004-07
Chief Legislative Officer, Office of the Governor, 2015-2016
Judge, Court of Appeals, 3rd Appellate Judicial Circuit, 2016 -
Architectural Historian and Historic Preservation Researcher/Writer
Author: Uniontown, Maryland-Walking Tour, 1983; Carroll’s Heritage: Essays on the Architecture of a Piedmont Maryland County, 1987; The Engine of Liberty & Uniontown Advertiser, 1993
Married, Six children

December 4, 2017 3:16 P.M.