Former Senator Barry Glassman

District 35


Senator Barry Glassman
TenureMember of the Maryland House of Delegates, representing District 35A, Harford County, January 13, 1999 to January, 2008. Appointed to the Senate, January 3, 2008. First elected to the Senate, 2010, representing District 35, Harford County. Resigned from the Senate December 1, 2014.
Party Affiliation
Republican
Past Senate Service
2008-2014
Finance Committee
2013-2014
Transportation Subcommittee of the Finance Committee
2011-2014
Joint Committee on Fair Practices and State Personnel Oversight
2011-2014
Joint Subcommittee on Program Open Space/ Agricultural Land Preservation
2011-2014
Joint Committee on Unemployment Insurance Oversight
2011-2014
Senate Co-Chair, Joint Committee on Protocol
2014
Joint Oversight Committee on the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange
2008-2014
Chair, Senate Select Committee No. 3, Harford County
Past House Service
2007-2008
Joint Committee on Legislative Ethics
2007-2008
Land Use and Ethics Subcommittee of the Environmental Matters Committee
2004-2008
Agriculture, Agriculture Preservation, and Open Space Subcommittee of the Environmental Matters Committee
2004-2008
Motor Vehicles & Transportation Subcommittee of the Environmental Matters Committee
2003-2008
Environmental Matters Committee
2003-2008
Joint Committee on Administrative, Executive and Legislative Review (AELR)
2003-2008, 1999-2000
Chair, Harford County Delegation
2007, 2003
Joint Committee on the Selection of the State Treasurer
2004-2006
Local Government and Bi-County Agencies Subcommittee of the Environmental Matters Committee
2004
Abatement of Drug-Related Nuisances Work Group of the Environmental Matters Committee
2004
Motor Vehicle Issues Work Group of the Environmental Matters Committee
2004
Co-Chair, Highway Safety and Speed Cameras Work Group of the Environmental Matters Committee
2003
Economic Matters Committee
2003
Banking, Economic Development, Science and Technology Subcommittee of the Economic Matters Committee
2003
Workers' Compensation Subcommittee of the Economic Matters Committee
1999-2003
Motor Vehicles Subcommittee of the Commerce and Government Matters Committee
Public Service
2011-2014
Maryland Health Care Reform Coordinating Council
2010-2014
Governor's Commission on Small Business
2007-2008
Communications, Financial Services and Interstate Commerce Committee, National Conference of State Legislatures
2006-2008
Task Force on the Future for Growth and Development in Maryland
2005-2007
Financial Services Committee, National Conference of State Legislatures
2005-2006
Joint Commission on the Maryland Port Administration
2002-2004
Study Commission on Public Funding of Campaigns in Maryland
2001-2002
Task Force to Study Motor Vehicle Salvage Inspection and Titling Practices
2000-2002
Task Force on Resource-Based Industry in Maryland
1990-1998
County Council, Harford County
1990-1998
Maryland Association of Counties
1990-1998
National Association of Counties
1990-1998
Rural Affairs Committee, National Association of Counties
1995
Vice President, County Council, Harford County
Memberships
2003-2008
Taxpayers Protection Caucus
2003-2008
Maryland Bicycle and Pedestrian Caucus
2003-2008
Republican Caucus (Chair, Republican Policy Committee)
2002-2008
Maryland Rural Caucus
2001-2008
Maryland Legislative Sportsmen's Caucus
2005-2008
Maryland Veterans Caucus (2008-2014)
1990-
Maryland Claims Adjusters
American Sheep Council
Harford County 4-H Club
Harford County Farm Bureau
Omicron Delta Kappa National Leadership Society
Awards
2009
Senator William H. Amoss Memorial Legislative Award
1984
Maryland State Firemen's Association
Henry Catlin Leadership Medal, Washington College
Biographical Information
Born, Havre de Grace, Maryland, March 24, 1962
Harford County Public Schools
Washington College, B.A., Political Science, 1984 (President, Student Government Association)
Former Claims Investigative Specialist, Travelers Insurance Company, 1986-90
Level Volunteer Fire Company, 1978- (President, 1989)
Small Business Owner
Married, One child

December 4, 2017 3:16 P.M.