Former Senator Sharon M. Grosfeld

District 18


Senator Sharon M. Grosfeld
TenureMember of the Senate January 8, 2003 to January 10, 2007, representing District 18, Montgomery County Member of the House of Delegates January 11, 1995 to January 8, 2003, representing District 18, Montgomery County
Party Affiliation
Democrat
Past Senate Service
2003-2007
Education, Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
2003-2007
Joint Committee on the Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Critical Area
2003-2007
Joint Committee on Children, Youth, and Families
Past House Service
1995-2003
Judiciary Committee
1999-2003
Joint Committee on Legislative Ethics
Biographical Information
Born in Brooklyn, New York, February 20, 1957
University of California, Santa Barbara
New York University, B.A. Sociology 1979, M.A. Sociology 1981
Antioch School of Law, J.D. 1985
Admitted to Maryland Bar 1987
Married, two children

December 4, 2017 3:16 P.M.