Former Delegate Jeannie Haddaway-Riccio

District 37B


Delegate Jeannie Haddaway-Riccio
TenureAppointed to the House of Delegates on August 4, 2003. Member of the House, August 19, 2003 to January 14, 2015. First elected to the House of Delegates, 2006, representing District 37B, Caroline, Dorchester, Talbot and Wicomico Counties.
Party Affiliation
Republican
Past House Service
2011-2013
Minority Whip
2003-2015
Economic Matters Committee
2007-2015
Public Utilities Subcommittee of the Economic Matters Committee
2007-2015
Business Regulation Subcommittee of the Economic Matters Committee
2011-2015
Property and Casualty Insurance Subcommittee of the Economic Matters Committee
2011-2015
Legislative Policy Committee
2011-2014
House Committee on Rules and Executive Nominations
2011
Joint Committee on the Selection of the State Treasurer
2011-2015
Joint Committee on Unemployment Insurance Oversight
2007-2010
Consumer Regulation and Commercial Law Subcommittee of the Economic Matters Committee
2007-2010
Deathcare Industry Workgroup of the Economic Matters Committee
2007-2015
Joint Committee on Federal Relations
2005-2010
Assistant Minority Whip
2005-2006
Corporations Workgroup of the Economic Matters Committee
2004-2006
Unemployment Insurance Subcommittee of the Economic Matters Committee
2004-2006
Workers’ Compensation Subcommittee of the Economic Matters Committee
2012-2013
Task Force to Study Maryland Insurance of Last Report Programs
2003-2015
Chair, Talbot County House Delegation
Public Service
2013-2014
Task Force to Study Licensing and Continuing Education Requirements for Electricians
2012
President Elect, Women Legislators of Maryland
2010-2011
First Vice President, Women Legislators of Maryland
2009-2010
Second Vice President, Women Legislators of Maryland
2008-2009
Secretary, Women Legislators of Maryland
2008
Coastal Bays Aquaculture Development Workgroup
2007-2008
Eastern Shore Task Force on Foster Care
2007-2014
Executive Board, Women Legislators of Maryland
2007
Task Force on Renewable Alternative Fuels
2004-2007
Task Force on the Status of Women and Information Technology
2006
Co-Chair, Legislative Committee, Women Legislators of Maryland
2005
Task Force on Lending Equity within Financial Institutions Providing State Depository Services
2003-2015
Treasurer, Eastern Shore Delegation
2003-2015
Mid-Shore Regional Council
2003-2015
Tri-County Council for the Lower Eastern Shore of Maryland
Memberships
2008
Character Counts! Coach, Talbot County
2007
Executive Board, Rural Maryland Council
2005-
Board of Directors, St. Michael's Community Center
2003-2015
Maryland Rural Caucus
2003-2015
Maryland Legislative Sportsmen's Caucus
2003-2015
Maryland Veterans Caucus
2002-
Advisory Board, Institute for Public Affairs and Civic Engagement, Salisbury University
2002-
Talbot County Republican Central Committee
Vice Chair, Mid-Shore League of Republican Women
Founder and Past President, Mid-Shore Young Republicans
Founding Member, Delmarva Planned Giving Council
Republicans for Environmental Protection
Caroline Chamber of Commerce
Dorchester Chamber of Commerce
Talbot County Chamber of Commerce
Talbot County Young Professionals
Leave A Legacy Delmarva
Rotaract of Easton
Biographical Information
Born, Easton, Maryland, April 30, 1977
Raised, Neavitt, Maryland
St. Michaels High School, 1995
Salisbury University, B.A., Political Science, 1999
Vice President of University Affairs (elected position), Salisbury University, 1998-99
Public Affairs Specialist, Department of the Environment, 1999
Administrative Assistant, Department of the Environment, 1999-2000
Development Associate, , Maryland-DC Office, National Audubon Society, 2000-01
Development Officer, Maryland-DC Office, National Audubon Society, 2001-03
Owner, Dragonfly Designs, LLC. (a graphic and web-design company)
Former Regional Coordinator, World Institute for Peace and Development, Washington, DC
Volunteer, Visitation Program for the Elderly, Church of God, Easton, Maryland
Assistant Sunday School Teacher, High School Class, Church of God, Easton, Maryland
Married

December 4, 2017 3:16 P.M.