Former Delegate Sue Hecht

District 3A


Delegate Sue Hecht
TenureMember of the House of Delegates January 11, 1995 to Janaury 8, 2003 and January 10, 2007 to January 12, 2011, representing District 3A, Frederick County
Party Affiliation
Democrat
Past House Service
2007-2011
Economic Matters Committee
1995-2003
Appropriations Committee
2009-2011
Joint Information Technology and Biotechnology Committee
2007-2009
Joint Technology Oversight Committee
Biographical Information
Born in Takoma Park, Maryland, December 7, 1947
Frederick Community College
Hood College, B.A. Management 1985
Frostburg State University, M.B.A. 1992
Married, two children

December 4, 2017 3:16 P.M.