Former Delegate Tom Hucker

District 20


Delegate Tom Hucker
TenureFirst elected to the Maryland House of Delegates, 2006. Member of the House January 10, 2007 to November 30, 2014, representing District 20, Montgomery County. Resigned November 30, 2014 to become member of Montgomery County Council on December 1, 2014.
Party Affiliation
Democrat
Past House Service
2011-2014
Economic Matters Committee
2011-2014
Consumer Protection and Commercial Law Subcommittee of the Economic Matters Committee
2011-2014
Property and Casualty Insurance Subcommittee of the Economic Matters Committee
2011-2014
Workers’ Compensation Subcommittee of the Economic Matters Committee
2011-2014
House Chair, Joint Committee on Federal Relations
2007-2010
Environmental Matters Committee
2007-2010
Environment Subcommittee of the Environmental Matters Committee
2007-2010
Land Use and Ethics Subcommittee of the Environmental Matters Committee
2007-2010
Natural Resources Subcommittee of the Environmental Matters Committee
Public Service
2007-2014
Bi-County Agency Committee, Montgomery County Delegation (Chair, 2011)
2007
Bi-County Committee, Montgomery County Delegation
2009-2010
Climate, Energy and Environment Policy Committee, Metropolitan Washington Council of Governments
2007-2010
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission (WSSC) Matters Committee, Montgomery County Delegation
2009-
White House Task Force of State Legislators for Health Care Reform
Memberships
2011-
Board of Trustees, Montgomery Parks Foundation
2009-2011
Maryland-India Business Roundtable
2007-
Board of Directors, Purple Line Now
2007-2014
Veterans Caucus
2007-
Progressive States Network
2007
Maryland for Obama Campaign
2006
Montgomery County Steering Committee, O'Malley/Brown Campaign
Special Advisor, League of Korean Americans of Maryland
Greater Silver Spring Democratic Club
Friends of Sligo Creek
National Association for the Advancement of Colored People (NAACP)
National Organization for Women (NOW)
Equality Maryland
Greater Silver Spring Chamber of Commerce
Former Member, Maryland Government Relations Association
Awards
2011
Award, Maryland Coalition of Interior Designers
2009
Legislator of the Year, Maryland Auto & Truck Recyclers Association
2007
Champion of Working Families Award, Progressive Maryland
2005
Defenders of Justice Award, Maryland Trial Lawyers Association (Maryland Association for Justice since 2008)
2005
Public Service Award, League of Korean Americans of Maryland
2002
Friends of Latinos Award, Hispanic Democratic Club
Biographical Information
Born, St. Louis, Missouri, April 9, 1967
Boston College, B.S., Biology, English, Philosophy, 1988
Regional Campaign Director, Fund for Public Interest Research (Environment America), 1990-95
Campaign Director, Progressive America Fund
Lead Organizer, Progressive Montgomery
Executive Director and Founder, Progressive Maryland, 2001-06
Progressive Maryland Education Fund, 2001-06
Consultant, U.S. Consumer Product Safety Commission, 2009-11
Eagle Scout
Married, One child

December 4, 2017 3:16 P.M.