Former Delegate Ruth M. Kirk

District 44


Delegate Ruth M. Kirk
TenureMember of the House of Delegates January 12, 1983 to January 12, 2011, representing District 44, Baltimore City
Party Affiliation
Democrat
Past House Service
1991-2011
Economic Matters Committee
1983-1990
Constitutional and Administrative Law Committee
2007-2011
Protocol Committee
1999-2004
Joint Committee on Federal Relations
Biographical Information
Born in Baltimore, Maryland, February 2, 1930
Married, seven children
Died in Baltimore, Maryland, June 17, 2011

December 4, 2017 3:16 P.M.