Former Senator Robert H. Kittleman

District 9


Senator Robert H. Kittleman
TenureMember of the Senate January 11, 2002 to September 11, 2004, representing District 9, Carroll and Howard Counties Member of the House of Delegates January 12, 1983 to January 10, 2002, representing District 14B, Howard and Montgomery Counties
Party Affiliation
Republican
Past Senate Service
2002-2004
Budget and Taxation Committee
2003-2004
Joint Committee on Legislative Ethics
2003-2004
Special Joint Committee on Pensions
2002-2004
Chair, Howard County Delegation
Past House Service
1995-2001
Minority Leader
1987-1994
Minority Whip
1994-2002
Commerce and Government Matters Committee
1983-1993
Economic Matters Committee
1987-1990, 1995-2002
Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
1987-1990, 1995-2001
Legislative Policy Committee
1996
Joint Committee on the Selection of the State Treasurer
1987-1998
Chair, Howard County Delegation
Biographical Information
Born in Omaha, Nebraska, January 31, 1926
University of Oklahoma, B.S. Engineering 1947
Served in U.S. Navy 1943-1946
Died in Baltimore, Maryland, September 11, 2004

December 4, 2017 3:16 P.M.