Former Delegate Christine M. Miller

District 26


Delegate Christine M. Miller
TenureMember of the House of Delegates January 13, 1982 to January 11, 1995, representing District 26, Prince George's County
Party Affiliation
Democrat
Past House Service
1994
Assistant Majority Floor Leader
1982-1995
Economic Matters Committee
1993-1995
Joint Committee on Administrative, Executive and Legislative Review
1990-1995
Joint Committee on Federal Relations
1989-1995
Joint Committee on Protocol
Biographical Information
Christine M. Miller Jones
Born in Navasota, Texas, December 25, 1929
Huston Tillotson College, B.A. 1949
Widow, one son, three children, three great-grandchildren
Died in Temple Hills, Maryland, January 26, 2013

December 4, 2017 3:17 P.M.