Former Delegate Kenneth C. Montague, Jr.

District 43


Delegate Kenneth C. Montague, Jr.
TenureMember of the House of Delegates December 17, 1986 to January 8, 2003, representing District 43, Baltimore City
Party Affiliation
Democrat
Past House Service
1987-2003
Judiciary Committee
1990-2003
Joint Committee on Legislative Ethics (House Chair)
1987-2003
Special Committee on Drug and Alcohol Abuse
2002
Joint Committee on the Selection of the State Treasurer
Biographical Information
Born in Baltimore, Maryland, August 25, 1942
University of Maryland
Morgan State College, B.A. English Literature 1967
University of Maryland School of Law, J.D. 1977
Volunteer, U.S. Peace Corps in Lesotho, South Africa 1967-1971
Maryland State Secretary of Juvenile Services, July 1, 2003 to January 17, 2007
Two children

December 4, 2017 3:17 P.M.