Former Delegate Darren M. Swain

District 24


Delegate Darren M. Swain
TenureFirst elected to the House of Delegates in 1998. Member of the House, 1999-2003. Appointed to the House of Delegates January 25, 2013 and sworn in January 28, 2013, serving until January 14, 2015, District 24 Prince George's County.
Party Affiliation
Democrat
Past House Service
1999-2003
Commerce and Government Matters Committee
1999-2003
Motor Vehicles Subcommittee of the Commerce and Government Matters Committee
2013-2015
Judiciary Committee
2013-2015
Juvenile Law Subcommittee of the Judiciary Committee
2013-2015
Legislative Black Caucus of Maryland, Inc
Public Service
2001-2003
Vice Chair, Legislative Review Committee, Legislative Black Caucus of Maryland, Inc.
2001-2003
Historically Black Colleges and Universities Committee, Legislative Black Caucus of Maryland, Inc.
2001-2003
Drug Treatment Committee, Legislative Black Caucus of Maryland, Inc.
2000-2003
Historian, Legislative Black Caucus of Maryland, Inc.
2000-2003
Civil Rights Committee, Legislative Black Caucus of Maryland, Inc.
2000-2003
Economic Development Committee, Legislative Black Caucus of Maryland, Inc.
1999-2003
Legislative Black Caucus of Maryland, Inc.
2000
Chair, Legislative Committee, Legislative Black Caucus of Maryland, Inc.
1999
Task Force to Study the Comprehensive Licensing of Automotive-Related Industries
Former Second Vice Chair, Prince George's County Delegation
Former Member, Bi-County Committee, Prince George's County Delegation
Memberships
1996-
Landover Educational and Recreational Non-Profit (LEARN) Foundation
1996
Board Member, Young Men's Christian Association (YMCA), Prince Georges County
Biographical Information
Born, Windsor, North Carolina, May 6, 1970
Bowie State University, B.S., Political Science, 1993 (President, Student Government Association, 1991-92)
Bowie State University, M.A., Administrative Management, 1995
Community Affairs Liason, Prince George's County, 1994
Business Analyst, Minority Business Opportunities Commission, Prince George's County, 1998-
Assistant Vice President for Alumni Relations, Bowie State University, 2008-

December 4, 2017 3:17 P.M.